Abarca et al v. AmeriHome Mortgage
Plaintiff: Monica Rae Abarca and Jose Louis Abarca
Defendant: AmeriHome Mortgage
Case Number: 3:2024cv00076
Filed: January 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Filing 12 Reply to Motion for Order to Show Cause #9 . Filed by Jose Louis Abarca, Monica Rae Abarca. (eo)
February 29, 2024 Filing 11 Declaration of Krystal Jones in Support of AmeriHome Mortgage Company, LLC's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Show Cause. Filed by AmeriHome Mortgage. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #10 .) (Welch, Joseph)
February 29, 2024 Filing 10 Response of Defendant AmeriHome Mortgage Company, LLC to Motion for Order to Show Cause #9 . Filed by AmeriHome Mortgage. (Welch, Joseph)
February 15, 2024 Filing 9 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Filed by Jose Louis Abarca, Monica Rae Abarca. (dino)
February 13, 2024 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by AmeriHome Mortgage. (Welch, Joseph)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - The Court GRANTS Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, ECF #6 . Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is due by March 22, 2024. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 2/12/2024.) (mja)
February 12, 2024 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to March 22, 2024. Filed by AmeriHome Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Welch, Joseph)
February 7, 2024 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dino)
January 22, 2024 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to AmeriHome Mortgage served on 1/16/2024, answer due on 2/6/2024. (dino)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/13/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/10/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 6/10/2024. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 1/12/2024.) (dino)
January 11, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued at Intake as to AmeriHome Mortgage. (dino)
January 11, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $403 collected. Receipt No. 105511. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Monica Rae Abarca, Jose Louis Abarca against AmeriHome Mortgage (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (dino)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abarca et al v. AmeriHome Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Rae Abarca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Louis Abarca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriHome Mortgage
Represented By: Joseph M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?