Rasmussen v. Powell et al
Petitioner: John Dennis Rasmussen
Respondent: Debra Powell, Jeff S. Pitzer, Peter M. Grabiel, Jolie A. Russo, Thomas M. Coffin and Patricia Sullivan
Case Number: 3:2024cv00487
Filed: March 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service upon Patricia Sullivan served on 3/22/2024, answer due on 4/12/2024 Filed by John Dennis Rasmussen. (gd)
April 15, 2024 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service upon Jeff S. Pitzer served on 3/22/2024, answer due on 4/12/2024 Filed by John Dennis Rasmussen. (gd)
April 15, 2024 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service upon Peter M. Grabiel served on 3/22/2024, answer due on 4/12/2024 Filed by John Dennis Rasmussen. (gd)
April 15, 2024 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service upon Debra Powell served on 3/21/2024, answer due on 4/11/2024 Filed by John Dennis Rasmussen. (gd)
April 15, 2024 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service upon Debra Powell served on 3/21/2024, answer due on 4/11/2024 Filed by John Dennis Rasmussen. (gd)
April 15, 2024 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service upon Jolie A. Russo served on 3/22/2024, answer due on 4/12/2024 Filed by John Dennis Rasmussen. (gd)
April 15, 2024 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service upon Thomas M. Coffin served on 3/22/2024, answer due on 4/12/2024 Filed by John Dennis Rasmussen. (gd)
April 15, 2024 USCA Appeal Fees re Notice of Appeal #5 : Received Fee in amount of $ 605. Receipt number 106657 issued. (fp)
April 12, 2024 USCA Case Number and Notice confirming Docketing Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal #5 . Case Appealed to Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 24-2321 assigned. (ecp)
April 11, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit. Related Documents: Order Dismissing Case #4 . (No IFP Granted and No Fee Paid). Filed by John Dennis Rasmussen. (dino)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF #1 . Defendants Russo, Coffin, and Sullivan are DISMISSED with prejudice. All other claims raised in Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF #1 , are DISMISSED. See attached Order for details. Signed on 3/26/2024 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/27/2024.) (jy)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/18/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/19/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 8/19/2024. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 3/20/2024.) (gd)
March 20, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Thomas M. Coffin, Peter M. Grabiel, Jeff S. Pitzer, Debra Powell, Jolie A. Russo, Patricia Sullivan. (gd)
March 20, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Receipt No. 106344. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by John Dennis Rasmussen against Thomas M. Coffin, Peter M. Grabiel, Jeff S. Pitzer, Debra Powell, Jolie A. Russo, Patricia Sullivan (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (gd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasmussen v. Powell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Dennis Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Debra Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff S. Pitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter M. Grabiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jolie A. Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas M. Coffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patricia Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?