Larson v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Nicole Larson
Case Number: 6:2013cv01096
Filed: June 30, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Janice M. Stewart
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (for Attorney Fees). Signed on 8/10/2016 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
July 6, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AWARDING EAJA ATTORNEY FEES (Granting Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA 27 ). See 1-page order attached. Signed on 7/6/2015 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
April 28, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court adopts in part and does not adopt in part Magistrate Judge Stewart's Findings & Recommendation 21 . Accordingly, the Commissioner's final decision is reversed and remanded for further administrative proceedings. See 3-page order attached. Signed on 4/28/2015 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: Adrian L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Larson
Represented By: Juliana E. Coons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?