Serenity Lane v Netsmart Technologies, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Serenity Lane
Defendant: Netsmart Technologies, Inc. and Sequest Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2014cv00038
Filed: January 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Coffin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER: Denying Motion for Summary Judgment 85 . Granting Alternative Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 85 limiting defendants' liability to the $135,000 plaintiff paied for the TIER software product license fee. Signed on 2/6/2017 by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER: Magistrate Judge Coffin's Findings and Recommendation 81 is adopted and Plaintiff's First Claim for rescission in its First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED. Signed on 4/13/2016 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: Adopting Judge Coffin's Findings and Recommendation 59 in Full. Accordingly, defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 44 is Granted in Part and Denied in Part, and Defendant's Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Plaintiff's answers to requests for admissions 51 is Denied. Plaintiff's first, second, and third claims for relief are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's claim for prejudgment interest in its fourth claim for relief is stricken. Signed on 6/22/2015 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serenity Lane v Netsmart Technologies, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netsmart Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequest Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serenity Lane
Represented By: Dennis W. Percell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?