Nussbaumer v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Benny Nussbaumer
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2015cv01473
Filed: August 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Janice M. Stewart
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER for Attorney Fees - 42 U.S.C. §406(b). Signed on 11/19/2021 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER (EAJA Fees). Signed on 4/6/2017 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION AND ORDER. Upon careful review, I agree with Judge You's recommendation and I ADOPT the F&R 24 as my own opinion. Signed on 1/3/2017 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (pvh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nussbaumer v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Janice E. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Nussbaumer
Represented By: Bruce W. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?