Rolfe v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Greggory A. Rolfe
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2016cv00096
Filed: January 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: John Jelderks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees 31 . Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 406(b) is hereby GRANTED, and Plaintiff's counsel is awarded $13,910.10 in attorney's fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). See Order for further details. Signed on 11/18/2019 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Granting Stipulated Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA 28 . Based upon the Stipulation of the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that attorney fees in the amount of $8,975.53 are hereby awarded to Plaintiff, pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA), 28 U.S.C. § 2412. Signed on 2/26/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The Court adopts Magistrate Judge Jelderks' Findings and Recommendation 23 . Accordingly, the Commissioner's final decision is reversed and this case is remanded for further proceedings. Signed on 11/21/2017 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jtj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rolfe v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Janice E. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greggory A. Rolfe
Represented By: Katherine Eitenmiller
Represented By: Brent Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?