OmniGen Research, LLC et al v. Wang et al

Plaintiff: OmniGen Research, LLC and Prince Agri Products, Inc.
Defendant: Bioshen, Yongqiang Wang and Yan Zheng
Case Number: 6:2016cv00268
Filed: February 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael J. McShane
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 FINDING OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: Plaintiffs are entitled to the injunctive relief outlined in paragraphs 268 to 280, total damages in the amount of $2,807,750.00, attorneys fees in the amount of $986,989.50, and costs in the amount of $57,030.67. Signed on 11/16/2017 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Terminating Spoliation Sanctions 129 is Granted. The Court will issue an Order of Default Judgment in favor of the Plaintiffs, and Defendants' counterclaims are dismissed. Defendants 9; Motion for Summary Judgment 126 and 130 , Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 177 , and Plaintiffs' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment 119 , 120 and 123 are all denied as moot. A further hearing regarding damages will be set by the court. Signed on 5/23/2017 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss 76 is denied as moot. Signed on 7/27/2016 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 12 . Signed on 5/12/2016 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) Modified on 5/13/2016 to correct docket text(cp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OmniGen Research, LLC et al v. Wang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bioshen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yongqiang Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yan Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OmniGen Research, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Davis
Represented By: Klaus H. Hamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Agri Products, Inc.
Represented By: Scott E. Davis
Represented By: Klaus H. Hamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?