Williams v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sara J. Williams
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2016cv00439
Filed: March 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael W. Mosman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of Commissioner's Final Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 USC 406b 33 . Attorney fees in the amount of $1,709.54 ($8,974.54 less $7,265.09 EAJA Fees previously paid) are hereby awarded to Plaintiff's Attorney pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b). See Order for further details. Signed on 2/27/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Granting Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA 29 . Signed on 2/5/2018 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION AND ORDER: The Commissioner's ultimate decision was not based on substantial evidence and free of harmful legal error. Accordingly, the Commissioner's decision is REVERSED and this case REMANDED for immediate calculation and payment benefits. Signed on 10/23/2017 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (jtj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Janice E. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara J. Williams
Represented By: Richard F. McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?