Seawater Seafoods Company et al v. Dulcich et al
Plaintiff: Front St. Marine LLC, Bret Hamrick and Seawater Seafoods Company
Defendant: Frank Dulcich, Dulcich Realty Acquisition, LLC, Pacific Fishing LLC, Pacific Hooker, LLC and Pacific Seafood Group
Case Number: 6:2016cv01607
Filed: August 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael J. McShane
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint 57 is denied. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 53 is granted. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's remaining state law claims. This action is therefore dismissed with prejudice. Signed on 3/23/2018 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION AND ORDER: Denying Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order 38 . Signed on 8/18/2017 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 12 is denied. The Court will set a date for a Rule 16 Conference to set new case management deadlines and a trial date. Signed on 7/17/2017 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seawater Seafoods Company et al v. Dulcich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Dulcich
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Randolph C. Foster
Represented By: Timothy W. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dulcich Realty Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Randolph C. Foster
Represented By: Timothy W. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Fishing LLC
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Randolph C. Foster
Represented By: Timothy W. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Hooker, LLC
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Randolph C. Foster
Represented By: Timothy W. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Seafood Group
Represented By: Brad S. Daniels
Represented By: Randolph C. Foster
Represented By: Timothy W. Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Front St. Marine LLC
Represented By: Eric J. Brickenstein
Represented By: Michael E. Haglund
Represented By: Michael K. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret Hamrick
Represented By: Eric J. Brickenstein
Represented By: Michael E. Haglund
Represented By: Michael K. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seawater Seafoods Company
Represented By: Eric J. Brickenstein
Represented By: Michael E. Haglund
Represented By: Michael K. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?