Munson v. Wells Fargo Bank
Plaintiff: Steve Munson
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 6:2018cv00650
Filed: April 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael J. McShane
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Opinion and Order: Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 17 . Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice and without leave to amend. Signed on 12/11/2018 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Plaintiff has 14 days to file an amended complaint meeting the heightened pleadings standards under rule 9(b). Wells Fargo will of course be free to move to dismiss Munson's amended complaint and shall not conduct the foreclosure sale until the Court rules on any motions following Munson's filing of the amended complaint. Signed on 7/27/2018 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Copy mailed to plaintiff) (cp)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER: , Defendants motion to dismiss 5 is granted. The claim for violation of OAR 137-110 is dismissed with prejudice. The claim for fraud is dismissed without prejudice. Signed on 6/11/2018 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munson v. Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Robert A. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?