Doe v. Oregon State University
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Oregon State University
Case Number: 6:2018cv01432
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Eugene (6) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed on 9/24/2018 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
September 19, 2018 Filing 17 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal) (Lauersdorf, Andrew)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #15 . Answer is due by 9/19/2018. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer titled Stipulated Motion for Second Extension of Deadline to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Oregon State University. (Levelle Haslitt, Naomi)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #13 . Answer is due by 9/12/2018. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
September 4, 2018 Filing 13 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer titled Stipulated Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Oregon State University. (Levelle Haslitt, Naomi)
August 27, 2018 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service upon Oregon State University served on 8/15/2018 Filed by Jane Doe. (Lauersdorf, Andrew)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Laura L. Dunn (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: lldunn. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (cp)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Laura L. Dunn for Jane Doe. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5502284 issued. Signed on 8/16/2018 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oregon State University. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion to proceed as Jane Doe #2 and Granting Motion to Seal Document 6 . Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/6/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/7/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/7/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Filed by Jane Doe. (Lauersdorf, Andrew)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding Complaint #1 filed by Jane Doe. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record. The Clerk is directed to make the following administrative corrections to the record and, if necessary, regenerate the Notice of Electronic Filing to all parties: Plaintiff paid the filing fee, but selected IFP status when filing the Complaint #1 . The Clerk is ordered to edit docket entry #1 to remove the IFP status and add the payment information. (plb)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laura L. Dunn . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5502284. Filed by Jane Doe. (Lauersdorf, Andrew)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym. Filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lauersdorf, Andrew)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5502244. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Jane Doe against Oregon State University (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lauersdorf, Andrew) Removed IFP status, added filing fee information and resent NEF on 8/1/2018 (plb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Oregon State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Janis C. Puracal
Represented By: Andrew C. Lauersdorf
Represented By: Laura L. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon State University
Represented By: Naomi Levelle Haslitt
Represented By: Taylor D. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?