Philadelphia Insurance Co. v. Jakel Motors Incorporated
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Insurance Co.
Defendant: JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED
Case Number: 6:2018cv01541
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Property Damage - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 Demand for Jury Trial by Jakel Motors Incorporated . Filed by Jakel Motors Incorporated. (Holm, Kristina)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Jakel Motors Incorporated. (Holm, Kristina)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/20/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/22/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/22/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED. (Holm, Kristina)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV27462 from Lane County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5525598 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Holm, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Insurance Co. v. Jakel Motors Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAKEL MOTORS INCORPORATED
Represented By: Kristina J. Holm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Insurance Co.
Represented By: J. Jason Marquoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?