Tucker v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Sharon Tucker
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01543
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Referring Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (eo)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference. Discovery is to be completed by 1/22/2019. Consent to Magistrate, if any, is to be filed by 2/21/2019. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/21/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Pretrial Order are due 30 days after dispostive motions are ruled on or by 3/26/2019 if no dispositive motions filed. Kyle Schumacher present as counsel for plaintiff. Brian Kiolbasa present as counsel for defendant. Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo presiding. (jk)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/16/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/15/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 2/15/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (bd)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 16 Conference is set for 9/18/2018 at 10:15AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. The Court will initiate the call. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, magistrate consent, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Ordered issued by the court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. Pursuant to this minute order the parties are relieved of their responsibility set forth in the Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, Section (c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (jk)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kiolbasa, Brian)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kiolbasa, Brian)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Sharon Tucker. (Schumacher, Kyle)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Filed by Sharon Tucker. (Schumacher, Kyle)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5526082 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Sharon Tucker against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Schumacher, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Tucker
Represented By: Kyle W. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brian T. Kiolbasa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?