Tedrow v. Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joy Tedrow
Defendant: Arthur Thomas Rambo, Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC and Godwin Chukwuemeka Eze
Case Number: 6:2018cv01609
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 Motion to Change or Transfer Venue . Filed by Joy Tedrow. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration) (Johnson, Gary)
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Arthur Thomas Rambo, Godwin Chukwuemeka Eze. (Schneider, Lea)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 Exhibits 1-4 re Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4 to Exhibits to Notice of Removal) (Schneider, Lea)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Association of Counsel Filed by All Defendants. (Ashton, Derek)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court Filed by All Defendants. (Ashton, Derek)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/31/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/28/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 1/28/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (kf)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 8/31/2018 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV35697 from Dechutes County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5539170 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC, Arthur Thomas Rambo, Godwin Chukwuemeka Eze. (Ashton, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tedrow v. Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Tedrow
Represented By: Gary R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Thomas Rambo
Represented By: Derek J. Ashton
Represented By: Lea K. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Co. of Arizona, LLC
Represented By: Derek J. Ashton
Represented By: Lea K. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godwin Chukwuemeka Eze
Represented By: Derek J. Ashton
Represented By: Lea K. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?