Organic Materials Review Institute v. American Cedar Technology Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Organic Materials Review Institute
Defendant: Henk NA Gorel, American Cedar Technology Corporation, David L. Glassel and Henk NA Gorel, III
Case Number: 6:2018cv01881
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #9 Summons/Service Return. The PDF attached to this entry at filing was incorrect. The document was missing a case caption cover page. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #8 Summons/Service Return. The PDF attached to this entry at filing was incorrect. The document was missing a case caption cover page. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 Frank C. Gibson Affidavit of Service Re: Mailing on Subservice Filed by Organic Materials Review Institute. (Gibson, Frank)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to David L. Glassel served on 12/10/2018, answer due on 1/2/2019. (Gibson, Frank) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/19/2018) (cw).
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to American Cedar Technology Corporation served on 12/10/2018, answer due on 1/2/2019. (Gibson, Frank) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/19/2018) (cw).
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to American Cedar Technology Corporation, David L. Glassel, Henk NA Gorel, III. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kf)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Filed by Organic Materials Review Institute. (Gibson, Frank)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Filed by Organic Materials Review Institute. (Gibson, Frank)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by Organic Materials Review Institute. (Gibson, Frank)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper. (bd)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/26/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/28/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/28/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. For Trademark Infringement Filing Fee Paid $400.00, Receipt #0979-5610043. Jury Trial Requested: No. Included patents/trademarks: 2,956,532--5/31/2005--Organic Materials Review Institute. Filed by Organic Materials Review Institute against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet). (Gibson, Frank) Modified on 10/29/2018 to add payment information (cw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Organic Materials Review Institute v. American Cedar Technology Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henk NA Gorel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Cedar Technology Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Glassel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henk NA Gorel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organic Materials Review Institute
Represented By: Frank Charles Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?