McClymonds v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: LaQuita McClymonds
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 6:2018cv01949
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint . Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Hiller, James)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 11/9/2018 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 3/8/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 4/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (kf)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV45352 from Marion County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5629088 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Hiller, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClymonds v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaQuita McClymonds
Represented By: Joshua Lay-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: James L. Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?