Baker v. APEO, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chelsea Baker
Defendant: Garnache Dental, LLC, APEO, LLC and Aspen Dental Management, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv02032
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 Amended Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Aspen Dental Management, Inc., APEO, LLC, Garnache Dental, LLC. (Parker, Douglas)
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference. Initial Disclosures are to be completed by 2/15/2019. Exchange of Expert Witness Statements must be completed by 5/31/2019. Rebuttal Expert Witness Statements must be completed by 6/28/2019. Discovery is to be completed by 7/26/2019. Dispositive Motions are due by 8/30/2019. Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 8/30/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Pretrial Order are due 30 days after dispositive motions are ruled on or by 9/16/2019 if no dispositive motions filed. Andrew Lewinter (by telephone) present as counsel for plaintiff. Jon Rue (by telephone) present as counsel for defendants. Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai presiding. (jk)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Scheduling Order: Rule 16 Conference is set for 1/8/2019 at 11:00AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The Court will initiate the call. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, consent to a magistrate judge, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order issued by the court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. Pursuant to this minute order the parties are relieved of their responsibility set forth in the Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, Section (c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
December 26, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by APEO, LLC, Aspen Dental Management, Inc., Garnache Dental, LLC. (Rue, Jonathan)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Aspen Dental Management, Inc., APEO, LLC, Garnache Dental, LLC. (Rue, Jonathan)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #5 upon Aspen Dental Management, Inc. served on 12/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Attachment) Filed by Chelsea Baker. (Lewinter, Andrew)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon APEO, LLC served on 12/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Attachment) Filed by Chelsea Baker. (Lewinter, Andrew)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Garnache Dental, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Aspen Dental Management, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to APEO, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Amended Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) Filed by Chelsea Baker. (Lewinter, Andrew)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/26/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/25/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 4/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5644236 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Chelsea Baker against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Lewinter, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. APEO, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Baker
Represented By: Andrew S. Lewinter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garnache Dental, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan G. Rue
Represented By: Douglas S. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APEO, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan G. Rue
Represented By: Douglas S. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Dental Management, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan G. Rue
Represented By: Douglas S. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?