Harris v. Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
Plaintiff: Tamara Harris
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., and Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Case Number: 6:2018cv02074
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Tamara Harris. (Sellers, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. waiver sent on 12/4/2018. Filed by Tamara Harris. (Sellers, James)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/3/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/3/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/3/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5654033 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Tamara Harris against Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons). (Sellers, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Harris
Represented By: James A. Sellers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?