N. Harris Computer Corporation v. Eugene Water & Electric Board
Plaintiff: N. Harris Computer Corporation
Defendant: Eugene Water & Electric Board
Case Number: 6:2018cv02165
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses N. Harris Computer Corporation. Filed by Eugene Water & Electric Board. (DeFreest, Eric)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Eugene Water & Electric Board waiver sent on 12/17/2018. Filed by N. Harris Computer Corporation. (Miller, Robert)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons sent to Eugene Water & Electric Board on 12/17/2018 by N. Harris Computer Corporation. Waiver of Service is due by 1/28/2019. Filed by N. Harris Computer Corporation. (Miller, Robert)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/16/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/16/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/16/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (kf)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by N. Harris Computer Corporation. (Miller, Robert)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 12/17/2018 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5671664 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by N. HARRIS COMPUTER CORPORATION against Eugene Water & Electric Board (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Miller, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N. Harris Computer Corporation v. Eugene Water & Electric Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. Harris Computer Corporation
Represented By: Robert B. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Water & Electric Board
Represented By: Eric Scott DeFreest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?