Ringhand v. Bestcare Treatment Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Teleah Ringhand
Defendant: Bestcare Treatment Services, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv02182
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Bestcare Treatment Services, Inc.. (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #6 . Answer is due by 1/24/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 Declaration of April Upchurch Fredrickson in Support of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #6 .) (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Bestcare Treatment Services, Inc. served on 12/20/2018 Filed by Teleah Ringhand. (Lundberg, Christopher)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bestcare Treatment Services, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 12/19/2018 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/18/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/20/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/20/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5674279 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Teleah Ringhand against Bestcare Treatment Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Lundberg, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ringhand v. Bestcare Treatment Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bestcare Treatment Services, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Copple
Represented By: April L. Upchurch Fredrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teleah Ringhand
Represented By: Christopher G. Lundberg
Represented By: Matthew E. Malmsheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?