Scott v. Delta Sand and Gravel Co. et al

Plaintiff: Ms. Sheila M Scott and Sheila M. Scott
Defendant: Delta Sand and Gravel Co. and Stanley H. Pickett
Case Number: 6:2018cv02202
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Stanley H. Pickett waiver sent on 12/31/2018. Filed by Sheila M. Scott. (Coit, Andrea)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Delta Sand and Gravel Co. waiver sent on 12/31/2018. Filed by Sheila M. Scott. (Coit, Andrea)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Stanley H. Pickett. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Delta Sand and Gravel Co. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/22/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/20/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/20/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by Sheila M Scott. (Coit, Andrea)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by Sheila M Scott. (Coit, Andrea)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Sheila M Scott. (Coit, Andrea)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5678505 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Sheila M Scott against All Defendants. (Coit, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Delta Sand and Gravel Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Sand and Gravel Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley H. Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Sheila M Scott
Represented By: Jonathan M. Hood
Represented By: Andrea D. Coit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila M. Scott
Represented By: Jonathan M. Hood
Represented By: Andrea D. Coit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?