Langley v. Kelly
Petitioner: Robert Paul Langley
Respondent: Brian Kelly
Case Number: 6:2019cv00073
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Referring Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (Death Penalty)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 Amended Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Robert Paul Langley. (dsg)
March 11, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 82699 issued. (tj)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: The application #1 is DENIED. Petitioner may file an amended application curing the deficiency within 30 days of the date of this order. The amended application must bear the Civil No. 6:19-CV-00073-HZ. Petitioner is advised that failure to file an amended application or to pay the requisite $5.00 filing fee for this habeas action will result in the dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 2/15/2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (joha) (Copy of this order and application IFP mailed to petitioner.)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (eo) Copy mailed to petitioner.
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (joha) (Copy Mailed to Petitioner.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Robert Paul Langley. (joha)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). Filed by Robert Paul Langley against Brian Kelly. (joha)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Robert Paul Langley. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langley v. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Paul Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?