N. et al v. Oregon Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: J. N., B. M., Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc., J. V. and E. O.
Defendant: Katherine Brown, Colt Gill and Oregon Department of Education
Case Number: 6:2019cv00096
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 24 Response to Motion for Extension of Time #21 . Filed by Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc., B. M., J. N., E. O., J. V.. (Stenson, Thomas)
March 15, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Association of Attorney Beth Andrews,Beth Andrews for Katherine Brown,Beth Andrews for Colt Gill,Beth Andrews for Oregon Department of Education. Filed by All Defendants. (Andrews, Beth)
March 15, 2019 Filing 22 Declaration of Darsee Staley . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #21 .) (Staley, Darsee)
March 15, 2019 Filing 21 Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by All Defendants. (Staley, Darsee)
February 7, 2019 Filing 20 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Michael Folger (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: mfolger. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (cp)
February 6, 2019 Filing 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ira A. Burnim . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5729593. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Bossing, Lewis)
February 4, 2019 Filing 17 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Lewis Bossing (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: lbossing. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (cp)
February 4, 2019 Filing 15 Motion for Leave to Appear , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Seth Galanter . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5725573. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stenson, Thomas)
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stenson, Thomas)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. Folger for Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc., B. M., J. N., E. O., J. V. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5708153 issued. Signed on 1/28/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (cp)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lewis Bossing for Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc, B. M.,, J. N., E. O., and J. V. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5708214 issued. Signed on 1/28/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (cp)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/23/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/24/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 6/24/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (kf)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 1/23/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The original PDF was not flattened. The PDF document is replaced with a flattened PDF document. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Selene Almazan . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5708964. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stenson, Thomas)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lewis Bossing . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5708214. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stenson, Thomas) (Main Document 9 replaced on 1/23/2019) (cw).
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Administrative Relief to Proceed Anonymously Using a Pseudonym and to File Under Seal. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stenson, Thomas) Modified motion type from "Protective Order" to "Seal Document"; changed docket text to match document on 1/25/2019; NEF regenerated. (kf)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Council of Parent Attorneys and Attorneys, Inc.. (Stenson, Thomas)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stenson, Thomas)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stenson, Thomas)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stenson, Thomas)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Folger . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5708153. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stenson, Thomas)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alice Abrokwa . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5708117. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stenson, Thomas)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5708057 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by E. O., Council of Parent Attorneys and Attorneys, Inc., J. V., J. N., B. M. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment). (Stenson, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N. et al v. Oregon Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. N.
Represented By: Thomas Stenson
Represented By: Joel D. Greenberg
Represented By: Lewis Bossing
Represented By: Michael W. Folger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. M.
Represented By: Thomas Stenson
Represented By: Joel D. Greenberg
Represented By: Lewis Bossing
Represented By: Michael W. Folger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Council of Parent Attorneys and Advocates, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Stenson
Represented By: Joel D. Greenberg
Represented By: Lewis Bossing
Represented By: Michael W. Folger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. V.
Represented By: Thomas Stenson
Represented By: Joel D. Greenberg
Represented By: Lewis Bossing
Represented By: Michael W. Folger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. O.
Represented By: Thomas Stenson
Represented By: Joel D. Greenberg
Represented By: Lewis Bossing
Represented By: Michael W. Folger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Brown
Represented By: Beth Andrews
Represented By: Darsee Staley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt Gill
Represented By: Beth Andrews
Represented By: Darsee Staley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Department of Education
Represented By: Beth Andrews
Represented By: Darsee Staley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?