RV Savvy Productions, Inc. et al v. RV Masters, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Mark J. Polk and RV Savvy Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Crossett David, RV Masters, LLC and David Crossett
Case Number: 6:2019cv00184
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by David Crossett waiver sent on 2/20/2019; RV Masters, LLC waiver sent on 2/20/2019. Filed by RV Savvy Productions, Inc.; Mark J. Polk. (Legaard, Brenna)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing Copyright Report to Register of Copyrights #3 . (kf)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Attachments: #1 Continued AO 121) (kf)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/7/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 7/8/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (kf)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5729662 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VA0001074620 2000--RV Education 101--Mark J. Polk, VA0001152029 2001--Class A Motor Home--Mark J. Polk, VA0001224452 2002--Winterizing and Storing your RV--Mark J. Polk, TXu001099838 2003--RV Education 101's Guide to RV Towing, Weights, Hitch Work and Backing--Mark J. Polk, Xu001099844 2003--RV Education 101's Checklist for RVers--Mark J. Polk. Filed by Mark J. Polk, RV Savvy Productions, Inc. against Crossett David, RV Masters, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons). (Legaard, Brenna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RV Savvy Productions, Inc. et al v. RV Masters, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark J. Polk
Represented By: Brenna Kristine Legaard
Represented By: Cristin A. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RV Savvy Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Brenna Kristine Legaard
Represented By: Cristin A. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossett David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RV Masters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Crossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?