Harris v. Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Plaintiff: Tamara Harris
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00195
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #6 . Answer is due by 5/1/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (French, Pilar)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #4 . Answer is due by 4/1/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (French, Pilar)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed as to Chase Bank USA, N.A. served on 2/8/2019, answer due on 3/1/2019. (Sellers, James)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/10/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 7/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (kf)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5731378 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Tamara Harris against Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Sellers, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Pilar C. French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Harris
Represented By: James A. Sellers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?