Benjamin v. Kelly

Petitioner: Anthony Benjamin
Respondent: Brandon Kelly
Case Number: 6:2019cv00259
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John Jelderks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Samuel A. Kubernick is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brandon Kelly. (Kubernick, Samuel)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brandon Kelly. Filed by Brandon Kelly. (Larsen, Lynn)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 6/10/2019. Petitioner has provided proof of payment of the $5.00 filing fee, thus the case may proceed. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (#3 ) is DENIED without prejudice to his right to refile the Motion after Respondent has filed an answer or other responsive pleading. Signed on 4/9/2019 by Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (Mailed to Pro Se party on 4/10/2019.) (joha)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #1 is DENIED. Should Petitioner wish to proceed with this case, he must submit the $5.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed on 3/11/19 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 3/12/19.) (dsg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John Jelderks. (Mailed copy to petitioner) (dsg)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Anthony Benjamin. (dsg)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Anthony Benjamin against Brandon Kelly. (dsg)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Anthony Benjamin. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin v. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brandon Kelly
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Samuel A. Kubernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?