Morris v. Holman Transportation Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lauri Morris
Defendant: Holman Transportation, Inc., Holman Transportation Services, Inc. and Leland Lawrence
Case Number: 6:2019cv00314
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane: Based upon the Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule #9 the Jury Trial is set for 2/10/2020 at 09:00AM in Eugene Courtroom 2 before Judge Michael J. McShane. Pretrial Conference is set for 2/3/2020 at 09:00AM in Eugene Courtroom 2 before Judge Michael J. McShane. Discovery is to be completed by 10/15/2019. Expert Reports are due 11/15/2019. Expert Discovery to be completed by 12/13/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/3/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule . Filed by Holman Transportation Services, Inc., Holman Transportation, Inc., Leland Lawrence. (Williams, Brian)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane. The 4/1/2019 Rule 16 Conference is vacated. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by 4/8/2019 advising the Court of proposed discovery and pretrial deadlines including a trial date. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 Reply to Defs' Answer and Aff Defs. Filed by Lauri Morris. (Prestwich, Travis)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane. Rule 16 Conference is set for 4/1/2019 at 10:00AM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Michael J. McShane. The Court will provide the parties with the conference call-in number by separate email. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 . Filed by Holman Transportation, Inc., Holman Transportation Services, Inc., Leland Lawrence. (Williams, Brian)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Holman Transportation Services, Inc., Holman Transportation, Inc.. (Williams, Brian)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 Demand for Jury Trial by All Defendants . Filed by All Defendants. (Williams, Brian)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 7/5/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/5/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 8/5/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (kf)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV58124 from Marion County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5759511 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Holman Transportation Services, Inc., Holman Transportation, Inc., Leland Lawrence (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Williams, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Holman Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauri Morris
Represented By: Travis S. Prestwich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holman Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Brian B. Williams
Represented By: Alison R. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holman Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brian B. Williams
Represented By: Alison R. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leland Lawrence
Represented By: Brian B. Williams
Represented By: Alison R. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?