Stellwagen et al v. Willamette Community Health Solutions

Plaintiff: Bryan Stellwagen and Andrew Hastings
Defendant: Willamette Community Health Solutions
Case Number: 6:2019cv00711
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Willamette Community Health Solutions. (Dudrey, John)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Willamette Community Health Solutions. (Dudrey, John)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #5 . Answer is due by 7/1/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, #1 . Filed by Willamette Community Health Solutions. (Dudrey, John)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to All Defendants. (Leiman, Alan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Willamette Community Health Solutions. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/4/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/4/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 10/4/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5842048 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Andrew Hastings, Bryan Stellwagen against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Leiman, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stellwagen et al v. Willamette Community Health Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Stellwagen
Represented By: Drew G. Johnson
Represented By: Alan J. Leiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hastings
Represented By: Drew G. Johnson
Represented By: Alan J. Leiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willamette Community Health Solutions
Represented By: Karen L. O'Connor
Represented By: John Baird Dudrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?