Spencer v. Lopez et al
Plaintiff: Alexandra Nicole Spencer
Defendant: Sergio Lopez and Marcos Antonio Vallejo-Flores
Case Number: 6:2019cv00729
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Matthew N. Miller appearing on behalf of Sergio Lopez, Marcos Antonio Vallejo-Flores Filed by on behalf of Sergio Lopez, Marcos Antonio Vallejo-Flores. (Miller, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance of Tyson L. Calvert appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Calvert, Tyson)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/6/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/7/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 10/7/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (kf)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5845583 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Alexandra Spencer against Sergio Lopez, Marcos Antonio Vallejo-Flores (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Fitzgerald, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Lopez
Represented By: Matthew N. Miller
Represented By: Tyson L. Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcos Antonio Vallejo-Flores
Represented By: Matthew N. Miller
Represented By: Tyson L. Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Nicole Spencer
Represented By: R. Bruce Dusterhoff
Represented By: Erin K. Fitzgerald
Represented By: James D. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?