Womack v Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Steven Womack
Defendant: CIGNA Corporation and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 6:2019cv00896
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Amended Summons Return of Service Executed as to Life Insurance Company of North America served on 7/11/2019, answer due on 8/1/2019. (Hittle, David)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #7 . Answer is due by 8/30/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Huggler, Hans)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint #5 . Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Huggler, Hans)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Life Insurance Company of North America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kf)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Amended Complaint . Filed by Steven Womack against Life Insurance Company of North America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons). (Hittle, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to CIGNA Corporation served on 6/11/2019, answer due on 7/2/2019. (Hittle, David)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 6/10/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/8/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/7/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/7/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (kf)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5883414 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Steven Womack against CIGNA Corporation (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Hittle, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Womack v Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Hans N. Huggler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Womack
Represented By: David W. Hittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?