Ditchen Berry Company, LLC v. Norcal Nursery, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ditchen Berry Company, LLC
Defendant: Norcal Nursery, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00900
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Property Damage - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of the Service of Summons. Filed by Ditchen Berry Company, LLC. (Malstrom, Tyler)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Norcal Nursery, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/9/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/8/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Ditchen Berry Company, LLC. (Malstrom, Tyler)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5883916 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Ditchen Berry Company, LLC against Norcal Nursery, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Malstrom, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ditchen Berry Company, LLC v. Norcal Nursery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ditchen Berry Company, LLC
Represented By: Tyler P. Malstrom
Represented By: Rebecca E. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norcal Nursery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?