Murdock v. Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tyler Murdock
Defendant: Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2019cv00917
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #8 . Answer is due by 9/12/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (ck)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Buhite, Russell)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company. (Buhite, Russell)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Russell S. Buhite appearing on behalf of Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company Filed by on behalf of Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company. (Buhite, Russell)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/15/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/12/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/12/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (kf)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notification of CM/ECF Account for William T. Reynolds, IV (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: wtreynolds. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of William T. Reynolds, IV for Tyler Murdock. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5887350 issued. Signed on 6/13/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (ck)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William T. Reynolds . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5887350. Filed by Tyler Murdock. (Bordelon, Jeremy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5886855 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Tyler Murdock against Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "A" - LTD Policy, #3 Exhibit "B" - Life Policy). (Bordelon, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murdock v. Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Murdock
Represented By: Jeremy L. Bordelon
Represented By: William T. Reynolds, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Pilot Financial Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell S. Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?