Barrett v. Laney

Petitioner: Jacob Henry Barrett
Respondent: Garrett Laney
Case Number: 6:2019cv01034
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Nick M. Kallstrom is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Garrett Laney. (Kallstrom, Nicholas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Anthony D. Bornstein is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Jacob Henry Barrett. (Bornstein, Anthony)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Garrett Laney. Filed by Garrett Laney. (Larsen, Lynn)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 9/10/2019. Signed on 7/12/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (joha)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL: Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #3 ) is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main, Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent Petitioner in this proceeding. See 18 U.S.C. 3006A(a)(2)(B). Signed on 7/12/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/12/2019. Petition #2 and this Order sent to FPD via interoffice mail on 7/12/2019.) (joha)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: IT IS ORDERED that petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. The petition may go forward without the payment of fees or costs. Signed on 7/3/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/10/2019.) (joha)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/1/2019.) (dsg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Declaration of Jacob Henry Barrett. Filed by Jacob Henry Barrett. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel #3 .) (dsg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Jacob Henry Barrett. (dsg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Jacob Henry Barrett against Garrett Laney. (dsg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Jacob Henry Barrett. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett v. Laney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Garrett Laney
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Nicholas M. Kallstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jacob Henry Barrett
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Represented By: Anthony D. Bornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?