Evans v. Guaranty RV, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael Evans
Defendant: Guaranty RV, Inc., abn Guaranty RV Centers and Guaranty RV, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01062
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order: Rule 16 Conference is set for 9/10/2019 at 10:45AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The Court will initiate the call. Please use a land line connection without external noise. The court prohibits speaker phones due to the greatly diminished sound quality. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, consent to a magistrate judge, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order issued by the court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. Pursuant to this minute order the parties are relieved of their responsibility set forth in the Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, Section (c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by Guaranty RV, Inc.. (Hawk, Christopher)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service upon Guaranty RV, Inc. served on 8/8/2019 Filed by Michael Evans. (Napoli, Jeff)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Guaranty RV, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/6/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/6/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/6/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5917095 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Michael Evans against Guaranty RV, Inc., abn Guaranty RV Centers (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Napoli, Jeff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Guaranty RV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guaranty RV, Inc., abn Guaranty RV Centers
Represented By: William Greg Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guaranty RV, Inc.
Represented By: William Greg Lockwood
Represented By: Christopher E. Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Evans
Represented By: Jeff S. Napoli
Represented By: Veronica R. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?