McFarland v. State of Oregon et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Mark McFarland
Defendant: Lane County, State of Oregon, Lane County Circuit Court, Patricia Perlow and Deborah Stoll
Case Number: 6:2019cv01066
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 8 is DENIED. Signed on 8/2/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (kf)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Appointment of Counsel . Filed by Kevin Mark McFarland. (McFarland, Kevin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Kevin Mark McFarland (Pro Se Filer admission). Your login is: kmcfarland. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (cp)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #4 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party (CM/ECF Registered User). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/23/2019.) (cp)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Kevin Mark McFarland. (cp)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Kevin Mark McFarland. (ecp)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/9/19.) (kf)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed IFP filed by Kevin Mark McFarland. (kf)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint and Request for Injunction. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Kevin Mark McFarland against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (kf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarland v. State of Oregon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane County Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Perlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Stoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Mark McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?