Alvarez v. University of Oregon et al
Plaintiff: James-Brent: Alvarez
Defendant: Geri Brooks, University of Oregon, Luke Sitts, Steven Barrett, U. of O. Police Department, Scott Geeting, Michael H. Schill and Matthew Carmichael
Case Number: 6:2019cv01071
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1986
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 22 Return of Service Executed as to Michael H. Schill served on 9/6/2019, answer due on 9/27/2019. (bd)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed as to Matthew Carmichael served on 9/6/2019, answer due on 9/27/2019. (bd)
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim titled Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support. Filed by All Defendants. (Levelle Haslitt, Naomi)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 Amended Complaint. Filed by James-Brent: Alvarez against Steven Barrett, Geri Brooks, Matthew Carmichael, Scott Geeting, Michael H. Schill, Luke Sitts, U. of O. Police Department, University of Oregon. (bd)
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim titled Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support. Filed by All Defendants. (Levelle Haslitt, Naomi)
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed as to U. of O. Police Department served on 7/17/2019, answer due on 8/7/2019. (bd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed as to University of Oregon served on 7/17/2019, answer due on 8/7/2019. (bd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed as to Luke Sitts served on 7/17/2019, answer due on 8/7/2019. (bd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed as to Scott Geeting served on 7/17/2019, answer due on 8/7/2019. (bd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to Geri Brooks served on 7/17/2019, answer due on 8/7/2019. (bd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed as to Steven Barrett served on 7/17/2019, answer due on 8/7/2019. (bd)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/12/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/12/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/12/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 07/15/2019.) (bd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to U. of O. Police Department. (bd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to University of Oregon. (bd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Luke Sitts. (bd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Scott Geeting. (bd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Geri Brooks. (bd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Steven Barrett. (bd)
July 12, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $400.00 collected; Receipt No. 13020 issued. (bd)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 7/11/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/11/2019.) (ck)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to James-Brent: Alvarez of Case Assignment Notice #2 . (bd)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by James-Brent: Alvarez against Steven Barrett, Geri Brooks, Scott Geeting, Luke Sitts, U. of O. Police Department, University of Oregon (Attachments: #1 Notice of Estoppel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Final Notice of Default, #4 2nd Notice of Default, #5 Notice of Default, #6 Attachment, #7 Attachment, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons titled "Writ of Manadamus in Quo Warranto"). No fee paid, no Application for IFP submitted. (bd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. University of Oregon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geri Brooks
Represented By: Ivan Resendiz Gutierrez
Represented By: Naomi Levelle Haslitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Oregon
Represented By: Ivan Resendiz Gutierrez
Represented By: Naomi Levelle Haslitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Sitts
Represented By: Ivan Resendiz Gutierrez
Represented By: Naomi Levelle Haslitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Barrett
Represented By: Ivan Resendiz Gutierrez
Represented By: Naomi Levelle Haslitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. of O. Police Department
Represented By: Ivan Resendiz Gutierrez
Represented By: Naomi Levelle Haslitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Geeting
Represented By: Ivan Resendiz Gutierrez
Represented By: Naomi Levelle Haslitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael H. Schill
Represented By: Naomi Levelle Haslitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Carmichael
Represented By: Naomi Levelle Haslitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James-Brent: Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?