Bailey-Ledford v. Gates
Plaintiff: Terry S Bailey-Ledford
Defendant: Travis Alan Gates
Case Number: 6:2019cv01097
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal 28 USC 157
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Motion (6) in case 6:19-cv-00617-MC. Amended complaint is due 9/3/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00617-MC, 6:19-cv-01097-MC (cp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulated Motion to clarify time for amending the wrongful death complaint and adversary proceeding and for defendant to appear. Filed by Terry S Bailey-Ledford. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00617-MC, 6:19-cv-01097-MC (Duncan, Charles) Modified motion type from misc. to clarify on 7/29/2019; attorneys noticed. (kf)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time (4) in case 6:19-cv-00617-MC. Answer is due by 9/3/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. Associated Cases: 6:19-cv-00617-MC, 6:19-cv-01097-MC (cp)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Motion to Withdraw Reference #1 is granted and the Report and Recommendation is adopted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 157(b)(5). The adversary proceeding 19-06022-tmr shall be consolidated with 6:19-cv-00617-MC. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. (eo) NOTE: This assignment notice replaces the inadvertently filed Bankruptcy Appeal Scheduling Order that was docketed this date.
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. (plb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey-Ledford v. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Alan Gates
Represented By: Kent Anderson
Represented By: Arnold H. Wuhrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry S Bailey-Ledford
Represented By: Charles Glenn Duncan
Represented By: Raymond J. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?