Sackcloth & Ashes, L3C v. Sackcloth & Ashes LLC
Plaintiff: Sackcloth & Ashes, L3C
Defendant: Sackcloth & Ashes LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv01127
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper. (ck)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT: This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed on 9/9/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Schwartz, Elizabeth)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5932281. The request has been granted and the amount of $400.00 will be refunded to Elizabeth Schwartz Related Doc #6 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (nd)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Refund Request Due, 5 . Filed by Sackcloth & Ashes, L3C. (Attachments: #1 Attachment NEF, #2 Attachment Electronic payment receipts) (Schwartz, Elizabeth)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 A duplicate payment in the amount of $400.00 was submitted by Sackcloth & Ashes, L3C in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 8/1/2019. (nd)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper. (kf)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 7/22/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/19/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/19/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/19/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (kf)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5932368 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 4,323,994--4/23/2013--Sackcloth & Ashes, L3C, 4,363,737--7/9/2013--Sackcloth & Ashes, L3C, 4,431,401--11/12/2013--Sackcloth & Ashes, L3C. Filed by Sackcloth & Ashes, L3C against Sackcloth & Ashes LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons). (Schwartz, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sackcloth & Ashes, L3C v. Sackcloth & Ashes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sackcloth & Ashes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sackcloth & Ashes, L3C
Represented By: Elizabeth Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?