M.B. v. Springfield School District No. 19
Plaintiff: M.B.
Defendant: Springfield School District No. 19
Case Number: 6:2019cv01150
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by M.B.. (Sherman, Kimberly)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Springfield School District No. 19 waiver sent on 8/8/2019. Filed by M.B.. (Sherman, Kimberly)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking IDs: 0979-5937915 and 0979-5938025. The request has been granted and the amount of $800.00 will be refunded to Kimberly Hope Sherman Related Doc #4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (ljp)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Complaint, #1 , Refund Request Due, 3 . Filed by M.B.. (Sherman, Kimberly)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Two duplicate payments in the amount of $800.00 ($400.00 each) were submitted by M.B. in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 8/8/2019. (nd)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/22/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/23/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/23/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (bd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Appeal of Hearing Officer Findings Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5938056 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by M.B. against Springfield School District No. 19 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Sherman, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.B. v. Springfield School District No. 19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.B.
Represented By: Kimberly Hope Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springfield School District No. 19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?