Murphy v. Laney
Petitioner: Robert Doyle Murphy
Respondent: Garrett Laney
Case Number: 6:2019cv01185
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney James M. Aaron is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Garrett Laney. (Aaron, James)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Garrett Laney. Filed by Garrett Laney. (Larsen, Lynn)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Finding as Moot petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #1 as petitioner paid the filing fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/19/2019.) (ps1)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 11/18/2019. Signed on 9/18/2019 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/18/2019.) (joha)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg)
August 26, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5 collected; Receipt No. 85282 issued. (fp)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/31/2019.) (joha)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (joha)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). Filed by Robert Doyle Murphy against Garrett Laney. (joha)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Robert Doyle Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Funds Withdrawal Request) (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Laney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Garrett Laney
Represented By: James M. Aaron
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Doyle Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?