Newell v. Western Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ash Newell
Defendant: Western Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01258
Filed: August 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Western Communications, Inc.. (Schoen, Ava)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Forum Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Western Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ava L. Schoen) (Schoen, Ava)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing Copyright Report #3 to Register of Copyrights. (kf)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (kf)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/10/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/9/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/9/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (kf)
August 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5958445 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Ash Newell against Western Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form). (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newell v. Western Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ash Newell
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Ava L. Schoen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?