Rolfe v. O.S.P. et al
Petitioner: Austin Louis Rolfe
Respondent: K. Kelly and O.S.P.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01261
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Austin Louis Rolfe. (jw)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Judge Michael J. McShane. Petitioner must submit the $5.00 filing fee or a certified copy of his inmate trust account showing his inability to pay the fee, and submit a completed Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus within 30 days from receipt of the Order. (Mailed to Pro Se party with a 2254 Petition form on 9/13/19.) (kf)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Financial Eligibility by Rolfe Austin Louis in Support of Application for leave to proceed ifp #1 . Filed by Austin Louis Rolfe. (kf)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (kf)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/12/2019.) (dsg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Austin Louis Rolfe against K. Kelly, O.S.P.. (dsg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Austin Louis Rolfe. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rolfe v. O.S.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Austin Louis Rolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: K. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: O.S.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?