Vance v. Sears Holdings Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Logan Harris Vance
Defendant: MTD Products and Sears Holdings Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv01275
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mustafa T Kasubhai
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Filed by Logan Harris Vance. (bd)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Findings & Recommendation #4 is referred to Judge Michael J. McShane. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/8/2019.) (jk)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Findings & Recommendation: The Court recommends denying Vance's application to proceed IFP #2 based on the information in Vance's economic application, and the Court should decline ruling on the merits of his claims. His complaint #1 should be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 10/21/2019. Signed on 10/7/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/8/2019.) (jk)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/14/19.) (kf)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed IFP filed by Logan Harris Vance. (kf)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Logan Harris Vance against Sears Holdings Corporation, MTD Products. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vance v. Sears Holdings Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTD Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Harris Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?