Raybould v. Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Raybould
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT, U.S. Bank National Association and JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Case Number: 6:2019cv01364
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 14 Reply to Request for Judicial Notice #11 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #10 . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Kono, Kevin)
October 3, 2019 USCA Case Number and Notice confirming Docketing Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal #13 . Case Appealed to Ninth Circuit Case Number 19-35842 assigned. (kf)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appeal to USCA for the 9th Circuit. Related Documents: Discovery order #3 , Case Management Order #5 , Order 7 , Order 9 . (No IFP Granted and No Fee Paid). Filed by Dennis Raybould. (kf)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 Declaration of Kevin H. Kono in Support of Request for Judicial Notice. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Related document(s): Request for Judicial Notice #11 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #10 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15) (Kono, Kevin)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Judicial Notice . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Kono, Kevin)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Kono, Kevin)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time #8 . Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC and U.S. Bank National Association's Answer is due by 9/17/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/3/2019.) (ck)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Filed by Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Shelby, Stanton)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time #6 . JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association's Answer is due by 9/17/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/29/2019.) (ck)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Kono, Kevin)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 8/26/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/26/2019.) (ck)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing Discovery order #3 to Raybould. (kf)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/24/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/23/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/23/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (kf)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Kono, Kevin)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV30797 from Lane County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5977554 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Kono, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raybould v. Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Raybould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Stanton Crane Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Stanton Crane Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Ashlee Marie Aguiar
Represented By: Frederick B. Burnside
Represented By: Kevin H. Kono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?