Cleveland v. Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision
Petitioner: Christopher Lee Cleveland
Respondent: Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision
Case Number: 6:2019cv01423
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Based on the foregoing, this Court GRANTS Cleveland's request to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #3 ) and DENIES his Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #2 ), with leave to renew if this Court schedules an evidentiary hearing. The Court ORDERS Cleveland to file an amended habeas petition, within thirty days of the date of this Order, naming as respondents his parole officer and the official in charge of the Oregon Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision. The failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this proceeding. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 10/1/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to Petitioner on 10/2/2019.) (gw)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Christopher Lee Cleveland regarding Notice of Case Assignment #4 . (joha)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Notice of Case Assignment #4 sent to Christopher Lee Cleveland returned as undeliverable. (joha)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/5/2019.) (joha)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Christopher Lee Cleveland. Filed by Christopher Lee Cleveland. (joha)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Christopher Lee Cleveland. (joha)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). (NO IFP Filed, NO Filing Fee Paid) Filed by Christopher Lee Cleveland against Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision (Attachments: #1 Attachment). (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleveland v. Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Lee Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?