Hejazi v. Lane County Adult Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Hamid Michael Hejazi
Defendant: Lane County Sheriff's Office, Pre-Trial Services, Lane County Adult Corrections and Lane County
Case Number: 6:2019cv01451
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: The application (#2 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff may file an amended application curing the deficiency within 30 days of the date of this order. The amended application must bear the Case No. 6:19-cv-01451-HZ. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file an amended application will result in the dismissal of this proceeding. The Clerk of Court is directed to forward to Plaintiff a form application to proceed in forma pauperis with this Order. Signed on 10/31/2019 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Order and IFP Form Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/1/2019.) (joha)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to be added to Class Action and Given Intervenor Status by Ancle Price Reed. (kf)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to be Added to Class Action as a Plaintiff and Intervenor by Alexander Daniel Sholberg. (kf)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to be Added to Class Action as a Plaintiff and Intervenor by Jose Perfecto-Rocha. (kf)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to be Added to Class Action as a Plaintiff and Intervenor by Danilo Carranza. (kf)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to be Added to Class Action as a Plaintiff and Intervenor by Julian Lane. (kf)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Designate Case as a Class Action. Filed by Hamid Michael Hejazi. (joha)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/10/19.) (kf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Fee Waiver filed by Hamid Michael Hejazi. (kf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Hamid Michael Hejazi against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hejazi v. Lane County Adult Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pre-Trial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane County Adult Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamid Michael Hejazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?