Karelic v. Aqua Serene Inc.
Plaintiff: Yair Karelic
Defendant: Aqua Serene Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv01756
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Denying Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice for Richard Liebowitz. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6089945 issued. Signed on 11/20/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (ck)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard Liebowitz . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6089945. Filed by Yair Karelic. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (kf)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Aqua Serene Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kf)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 3/17/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/16/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 4/16/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (kf)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Richard Liebowitz (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: rliebowitz. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ck)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard Liebowitz for Yair Karelic. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6083728 issued. Signed on 11/15/2019 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (ck)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard Liebowitz . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6083728. Filed by Yair Karelic. (Liebowitz, Richard)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order by Judge Michael J. McShane: Plaintiff's counsel filed a complaint that appears to violate LR 83-1. Plaintiff's counsel does not appear to be admitted to practice in this district and has not filed an application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice under LR 83-3. This is not the first time Plaintiff's counsel has filed a complaint in violation of the same local rules. See 6:19-cv-1236-MC. Plaintiff is granted 14 days to show cause why this action shall not dismissed for failure to follow the local rules. Show Cause Response or Pro Hac Vice Motion to be filed by 11/19/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) Modified on 11/5/2019 to correct typo, resent nef(cp).
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6065156 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Yair Karelic against Aqua Serene Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form). (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karelic v. Aqua Serene Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yair Karelic
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Represented By: Michael O. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aqua Serene Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?