J and P Fishing, Inc. v. Gregorio et al
Plaintiff: J and P Fishing, Inc.
Defendant: Ozzie Gregorio, Darrel W. Potter, Fishermen's Terminal, G.P. Resources, Inc., aka General Petroleum Corporation, Astoria Marine Construction Company, Dennis G. Black, G.P. Resources, Inc., General Petroleum Corporation and D.W. Potter
Case Number: 6:2020cv00427
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0971
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/6/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/8/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 9/8/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (cw)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5.(Attachments: #1 Gregorio Summons 2, #2 Gregorio Summons 3, #3 Gregorio Summons 4, #4 Black Summons 1, #5 Black Summons 2, #6 Fishermens Terminal Summons, #7 General Petroleum Summons, #8 Astoria Marine Summons, #9 Potter Summons)(jw)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 Amended Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Ozzie Gregorio Address 2, #2 Proposed Summons Ozzie Gregorio Address 3, #3 Proposed Summons Ozzie Gregorio Address 4, #4 Proposed Summons Ozzie Gregorio Address 5, #5 Proposed Summons Dennis Black Address 1, #6 Proposed Summons Dennis Black Address 2, #7 Proposed Summons Fishermen's Terminal, #8 Proposed Summons General Petroleum Corporation a.k.a. G.P. Resources, Inc., #9 Proposed Summons Astoria Marine Construction Company, #10 Proposed Summons DARREL W. POTTER, a.k.a. D.W. POTTER) Filed by J and P Fishing, Inc.. (Spivak, Svetlana)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement J and P Fishing, Inc.S FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by J and P Fishing, Inc.. (Spivak, Svetlana)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jw)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 3/16/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons of Gregorio and G.P. Resources Inc. aka General Petroleum Corporation, #2 Proposed Summons of Astoria Marine Construction Company, #3 Proposed Summons of Dennis G. Black, #4 Proposed Summons of Darrel W. Potter, #5 Proposed Summons of Fishermen's Terminal) Filed by J and P Fishing, Inc.. (Spivak, Svetlana)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6405711 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by J and P Fishing, Inc. against Astoria Marine Construction Company, Dennis G. Black, Fishermen's Terminal, G.P. Resources, Inc., aka General Petroleum Corporation, Ozzie Gregorio, Darrel W. Potter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet). (Spivak, Svetlana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J and P Fishing, Inc. v. Gregorio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozzie Gregorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel W. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fishermen's Terminal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.P. Resources, Inc., aka General Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astoria Marine Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis G. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.P. Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.W. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J and P Fishing, Inc.
Represented By: Svetlana P. Spivak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?