Wehr v. State of Oregon
Petitioner: Brian Lee Wehr
Respondent: State of Oregon
Case Number: 6:2020cv00516
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Samuel A. Kubernick is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by State of Oregon. (Kubernick, Samuel)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of State of Oregon. Filed by State of Oregon. (Larsen, Lynn)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254, #1 on respondent. Answer is due by 7/6/2020. Signed on 5/6/2020 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment, #2 Petition)(Mailed order to Pro Se party on 5/6/2020.) (dsg)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel #2 is DENIED with leave to renew after an answer and response are filed. Signed on 5/6/2020 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 5/6/2020.) (dsg)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 3/30/2020.) (joha)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Brian Lee Wehr. (joha)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State) Filing Fee in amount of $5.00 collected. Receipt No. 13349 issued. Filed by Brian Lee Wehr against State of Oregon (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment). (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wehr v. State of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Oregon
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Samuel A. Kubernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Lee Wehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?