Nulph v. Laney
Petitioner: George William Nulph
Respondent: Garrett Laney
Case Number: 6:2020cv00945
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Nick M. Kallstrom is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Garrett Laney. (Kallstrom, Nicholas)
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Anthony D. Bornstein is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by George William Nulph. (Bornstein, Anthony)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Garrett Laney. Filed by Garrett Laney. (Larsen, Lynn)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #2 on respondent. Answer is due by 8/18/2020. Signed on 6/19/2020 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (joha)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL: Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #3 ) is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main, Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent Petitioner in this proceeding. See 18 U.S.C. 3006A(a)(2)(B). The Clerk is directed to send the Federal Public Defender a copy of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed on 6/19/2020 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/19/2020. Petition #2 and this Order Emailed to FPD on 6/19/2020.) (joha)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: Petitioner moves to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ). An examination of the application reveals that petitioner is unable to afford the costs of this action. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. The petition may go forward without the payment of fees or costs. Signed on 6/19/2020 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/19/2020.) (joha)
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/16/2020.) (dsg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Declaration of George William Nulph. Filed by George William Nulph. (Related document(s): Motion to Appoint Counsel #3 .) (dsg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by George William Nulph. (dsg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). In forma pauperis pending. Filed by George William Nulph against Garrett Laney. (dsg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by George William Nulph. (dsg) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/18/2020) (cw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nulph v. Laney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George William Nulph
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Represented By: Anthony D. Bornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Garrett Laney
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Nicholas M. Kallstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?